Derksen, Brent Harvey (CPSO#: 65549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone: (905) 684-1827
Fax: (905) 688-7283
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Segue Clinic
626 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3B 3Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 788-3614
Fax: (905) 788-3040
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Segue Clinic
840 Queenston Road, Unit 826
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 4A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 664-1304
Fax: (905) 664-1359
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Segue Clinic
97 Charlotte Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 3E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 834-7272
Fax: (905) 834-1001
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Segue Clinic
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1333
Fax: (905) 522-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Segue Clinic
8 Clairmont Street, Unit 1
Thorold ON  L2V 1R1
Canada
Phone: 289-479-5703
Fax: 905-680-9898
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacKay Derksen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Derksen ( CPSO# 65549 )
Dr. R. Mackay ( CPSO# 32159 )

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827


Corporation Name: Brent Derksen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Derksen ( CPSO# 65549 )

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
626 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3B 3Y2
Phone Number: (905) 788-3614

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
826 - 840 Queenston Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 664-1304

Business Address:
AccessMD Occupational Health
4632 Victoria Avenue
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 4B7
Phone Number: (905) 358-7720

Business Address:
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 522-1333


Corporation Name: Derksen And Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Derksen ( CPSO# 65549 )
Dr. R. Mackay ( CPSO# 32159 )

Business Address:
4632 Victoria Avenue
Niagara Falls ON  L3C 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 358-7720

Business Address:
8 Clairmont Street
Thorold ON  L2V 1R1
Phone Number: (289) 479-5703

Business Address:
816 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3C 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 788-3614

Business Address:
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827

Business Address:
Segue Clinic Hamilton
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 522-1333

Business Address:
Segue Clinic Port Colborne
97 Charlotte Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 834-7272

Business Address:
840 Queenston Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 644-1358


Corporation Name: Brent Derksen Fraser Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT HARVEY DERKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERKSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993