Dermer, Stanley Winston (CPSO#: 25131)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.W. Dermer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 13 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 32 Ravine Dr Dundas, ON L9H 6K7
Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to the above address.
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018