Desai, Devanshu Dolatrai (CPSO#: 57231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Gujarat University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6486 Ext. 3019
Fax: (416) 530-6076
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1281 St. Clair Ave W
Toronto ON  M6E 1B8
Canada
Phone: 416-248-2050 Ext. 5522
Fax: 416-248-6557
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

59 Adelaide St E
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-260-2826
Fax: 416-260-5074
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devanshu Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Desai ( CPSO# 57231 )

Business Address:
7 Haliburton Avenue
Toronto ON  M9B 4Y3
Phone Number: (416) 234-5734

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEVANSHU DOLATRAI DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991