Desai, Milind Gunvantrai (CPSO#: 61125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Gujarat University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4640 Jane Street
Suite 201
North York ON  M3N 2K5
Phone: (416) 663-1250
Fax: (416) 663-8561
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Milind Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Desai ( CPSO# 61125 )

Business Address:
201 - 4640 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3N 2K5
Phone Number: (416) 663-1250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILIND GUNVANTRAI DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 29, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)