Desai, Sagar (CPSO#: 88787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3695 Keele St, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M3J 1N2
Phone: (647) 484-0677
Fax: (416) 352-0099
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416)242-1000 Ext. 23000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sagar Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Desai ( CPSO# 88787 )
Dr. N. Dhillon ( CPSO# 93673 )

Business Address:
202 - 3695 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1N2
Phone Number: (647) 484-0677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAGAR DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013