Desarkar, Pushpal (CPSO#: 96963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2011

Expiry Date:  20 Oct 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Calcutta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH ANS
Unit 4 Room 401
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32726
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pushpal Desarkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Desarkar ( CPSO# 96963 )

Business Address:
CAMH ANS
Unit 4 Room 401
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 20 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Pushpal Desarkar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Desarkar holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration will expire on the earlier on the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on October 20, 2020, 
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Desarkar no longer holds the academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor in the Department of Psychiatry at the
                        University of Toronto, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Desarkar's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Desarkar's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 21, 2011.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 20, 2020.