Deshpande, Poorva Pramod (CPSO#: 91224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2018

Expiry Date:  14 Mar 2025

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nagpur University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Paediatrics
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 15 Mar 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2025

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Poorva Pramod Deshpande may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Deshpande holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Deshpande no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Deshpande's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Deshpande's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on March 15, 2018.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on March 14, 2025.