Desjardins, Nina Leah (CPSO#: 70571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON
St Thomas ON  N5R 3C6
Phone: (519) 631 2020
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 208
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Canada
Phone: (888) 256-7043
Fax: (888) 261-7116
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

121 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Canada
Phone: 647 350 6622
Fax: 888 261 7116
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.L. Desjardins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desjardins ( CPSO# 70571 )

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 3C6
Phone Number: (519) 631-2031

Business Address:
208-83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (888) 256-7043

Business Address:
121 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (647) 350-6622

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA LEAH DESJARDINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESJARDINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002