Deva, Djeven Parameshvara (CPSO#: 93514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Apr 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Deva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Apr 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Djeven Parameshvara Deva may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Cardiothoracic Imaging, University of Toronto,
                        in which Dr. Deva holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Deva  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Deva's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Deva's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 1, 2013. In accordance with paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration
                  Committee, automatically expire on April 30, 2020.