Deveau, Joey Steven (CPSO#: 97522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uxbridge Cottage Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joey Deveau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Deveau ( CPSO# 97522 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEY STEVEN DEVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2012