Devet, Gregory Casey (CPSO#: 96124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General and Marine
Hospital, 459 Hume St.
Collingwood ON
L9Y1W8
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Devet ( CPSO# 96124 )

Business Address:
229 Nelson Street
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Phone Number: (519) 538-1311

Business Address:
Collingwood General and Marine hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1Y0
Phone Number: (519) 986-3040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY CASEY DEVET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2013