Devraj, Amanda Laxmi (CPSO#: 91392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16- 31 Inverness Terrace
London W2 3JR
United Kingdom
Phone: 07462224880
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Devraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Devraj ( CPSO# 91392 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA LAXMI DEVRAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVRAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2013