Dewan, Ambika (CPSO#: 93378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South-East Ottawa CHC
600-1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 737-4809
Fax: (613) 739-3723
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Vincent Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
60 Cambridge Street N
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Canada
Phone: (613) 562-6262
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ambika Dewan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dewan ( CPSO# 93378 )

Business Address:
St. Vincent Hospital
Bruyere Continuing Care
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
South-East Ottawa CHC
Suite 600
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 737-4809

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBIKA DEWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012