Dewhirst, Sebastian (CPSO#: 95854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Dewhirst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dewhirst ( CPSO# 95854 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN DEWHIRST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEWHIRST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 2016 to 11 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 05 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017