Dhaliwal, Gurpreet Singh (CPSO#: 79789)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 May 2007 to 02 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History