Dhanjani, Dhiraj Gobind (CPSO#: 98077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: 519-344-2949
Fax: 519-344-7727
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dhiraj Dhanjani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dhanjani ( CPSO# 98077 )

Business Address:
DMI Professional Building
Suite 113
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-2949

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHIRAJ GOBIND DHANJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017