Dhawan, Shalini (CPSO#: 64135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: Singhal, Shalini (used until: 07 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
2575 Dundas Street West, Unit #15
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone: 905 820 3310
Fax: 905 820 3312
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCI The Doctor's Office
340 York Blvd.
Hamilton ON  L8R 3L2
Canada
Phone: 905 525 1677
Fax: 905 525 5112
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Arts
179 James St. South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A3
Canada
Phone: 905 777 9779
Fax: 905 777 9550
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1024 Upper Wentworth St.
Unit 5
Hamilton ON  L9A 4V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 318-3379
Fax: (905) 574-7701
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shalini Dhawan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhawan ( CPSO# 64135 )

Business Address:
Suite 15
2575 Dundas Street
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6

Business Address:
Suite 5
1024 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 4V9
Phone Number: (905) 318-3379

Business Address:
340 York Boulevard
Hamilton ON  K8R 3L2
Phone Number: (905) 525-1677

Business Address:
179 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A3
Phone Number: (905) 777-9779

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHALINI DHAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHAWAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992