Dhillon, Gurmohan Singh (CPSO#: 84503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, McCallum, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nasirzadeh ( CPSO# 93879 )
Dr. D. Walker ( CPSO# 33831 )
Dr. D. Soboleski ( CPSO# 59427 )
Dr. I. Silver ( CPSO# 79178 )
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 79597 )
Dr. E. Sauerbrei ( CPSO# 28818 )
Dr. J. Ricketts ( CPSO# 66593 )
Dr. B. Mussari ( CPSO# 65429 )
Dr. A. Menard ( CPSO# 79021 )
Dr. A. McCallum ( CPSO# 63659 )
Dr. J. Flood ( CPSO# 81434 )
Dr. D. Jabs ( CPSO# 70253 )
Dr. O. Islam ( CPSO# 69179 )
Dr. P. Fenton ( CPSO# 54474 )
Dr. C. Abraham ( CPSO# 70151 )
Dr. F. Cheeseman ( CPSO# 59183 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 86450 )
Dr. R. Butler ( CPSO# 86184 )
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )
Dr. D. Rumbolt ( CPSO# 93048 )
Dr. D. Dabreo ( CPSO# 93188 )

Business Address:
776 Blackburn Mews East
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
HDH
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
SMOL 752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8775

Business Address:
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A6
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417


Corporation Name: Gurmohan Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84503 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Care (St. Mary's Hospital)
340 Union Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 544-5220

Business Address:
KMI Clinic
835 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-8776

Business Address:
KMI Clinic
776 Blackburn Mews
Kingston ON  K7P 2N7
Phone Number: (613) 384-1220

Business Address:
Ongwanada Resource Centre
191 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 8A9
Phone Number: (613) 548-4417

Business Address:
Queen's University - Diagnostic Radiology
c/o Imaging Services, Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURMOHAN SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012