Dhillon, Hardeep Harvey Singh (CPSO#: 93469)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital, 600 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 1X5 OR Lakeridge Health, 95 Simcoe Street South, Oshawa, ON L1H 4G7
Date Received: 07 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015