Dhillon, Nimrit Kaur (CPSO#: 93673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd floor
3695 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1N2
Phone: (647) 484-0677
Fax: (416) 352-0099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sagar Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dhillon ( CPSO# 93673 )
Dr. S. Desai ( CPSO# 88787 )

Business Address:
202 - 3695 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1N2
Phone Number: (647) 484-0677

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMRIT KAUR DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2016