Dhir, Achal Kumar (CPSO#: 78676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 11 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017


Corporation Name: Dhir & Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhir ( CPSO# 78676 )
Dr. S. Dhir ( CPSO# 81737 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
SJHC
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ACHAL KUMAR DHIR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF ANAESTHESIA AND PERIOPERATIVE MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. DHIR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DHIR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DHIR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DHIR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DHIR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2003 to 16 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010