Dhurjon, Leland Menon (CPSO#: 75979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Clinic
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leland Menon Dhurjon Medicine - Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dhurjon ( CPSO# 75979 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Clinic
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LELAND MENON DHURJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHURJON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Apr 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2004