Di Ianni, Michael John (CPSO#: 84277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 529-3732 Ext. 46521
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Di Ianni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Di Ianni ( CPSO# 84277 )

Business Address:
Suite 218
1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 572-6868

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital, HHSC
Diagnostic Imaging Department
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 529-3732

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN DI IANNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI IANNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011