Di Prizito, Claudio Daniel (CPSO#: 76380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Hospital
Doctors Lounge Mail Box
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2985 Drew Road Unit 114
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A4
Canada
Phone: 647-2988220
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claudio DiPrizito Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Di Prizito ( CPSO# 76380 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 797-1723

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIO DANIEL DI PRIZITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI PRIZITO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005