Di Quinzio, Laura Marie (CPSO#: 80929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aspy Di Quinzio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Di Quinzio ( CPSO# 80929 )
Dr. W. Aspy ( CPSO# 80978 )

Business Address:
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE DI QUINZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI QUINZIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006