DiValentino, Dennis Ryan (CPSO#: 92740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
685 Main St. E
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K4
Phone: (289) 396-2316
Fax: (289) 396-2532
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

205 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3T 2G8
Canada
Phone: (519) 758-5800
Fax: (519) 758-5801
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

90 Wellington St N
Hamilton ON  L8R1N1
Canada
Phone: 905-570-1000
Fax: 905-570-1001
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DiValentino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. DiValentino ( CPSO# 92740 )

Business Address:
685 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K4
Phone Number: (289) 396-2316

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS RYAN DIVALENTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIVALENTINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012