Diambomba, Yenge (CPSO#: 74099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pediatrics
Room 19-231K
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5314
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YENGE DIAMBOMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAMBOMBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2002