Diaz, Liliana (CPSO#: 84895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: MacKenzie, Liliana (used until: 23 Oct 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De La Sabana, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 Chancellors Way
Unit 203A
Guelph ON  N1G 0E9
Phone: (519) 265-7700
Fax: (877) 892-0427
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1st Floor, J.T. Powell Building
50 Stone Road East,
Guelph, ON
N1G 2W1
Guelph ON  N1G2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 519-821-2308
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liliana Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIANA DIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 10 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014