Diaz, Roberto Jose (CPSO#: 90020)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2013