Didomizio, Laura Jane (CPSO#: 97056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Faculty of Health Sciences HSC-2F41
Urogynecology Division
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76338
Fax: 905-577-8377
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Didomizio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Didomizio ( CPSO# 97056 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Faculty of Sciences HSC-2F41
Urogynecology Division
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA JANE DIDOMIZIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIDOMIZIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2011 to 23 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014