Digby, Genevieve Christina (CPSO#: 92931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2370
Fax: 613-549-1459
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.C. Digby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Digby ( CPSO# 92931 )

Business Address:
Richardson House
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE CHRISTINA DIGBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014