Digby, Ian James (CPSO#: 73859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian J. Digby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Digby ( CPSO# 73859 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-1401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN JAMES DIGBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001