Dighe, Krupa Hasmukh (CPSO#: 85298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: Mali, Krupa Hasmukh (used until: 13 Jun 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Mumbai, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2464 Howard Avenue
Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: 519 977 6643
Fax: 519 915 6326
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905 883 1212 Ext. 3889
Fax: 905 883 2181
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Regional Hospital
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krupa Dighe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dighe ( CPSO# 85298 )

Business Address:
201 - 2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRUPA HASMUKH DIGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012