Dignam, Jennifer Miriam (CPSO#: 89088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kitchener Downtown CHC
44 Francis Street S.
Kitchener ON  N2G 2A2
Phone: 519-745-4404
Fax: (519) 745-3709
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Apr 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MIRIAM DIGNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIGNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011