Dilauro, Marc (CPSO#: 97560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Dilauro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dilauro ( CPSO# 97560 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 300-1053

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC DILAURO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILAURO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017