Dillon, David Andrew (CPSO#: 32354)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Comprehensive Healthcare Network, Cliffwood Plaza 3891 Don Mills Road Don Mills ON M2H 2S7 Phone: 647-532-7572
Date Received: 27 Apr 2016

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 31 Dec 1983
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1984 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1996
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1996
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 17 Apr 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Apr 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 11 Dec 1998
Terms and conditions amended by Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Andrew Dillon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 11, 2016:

Dr. Dillon was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice and whether he engaged in professional misconduct in his use of a physician assistant in a walk-in environment. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Dillon resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking: