Din, Shamoon Hasham (CPSO#: 92234)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Spanish, Urdu

Education:Grace University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shamoon Din Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014