Dingle, Jonathan Allan (CPSO#: 76202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anesthesia
1200 Main Street West
PO Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 75170
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ALLAN DINGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINGLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006