Dinh, Quynh-Dao Thi (CPSO#: 92007)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 20 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011