Dinniwell, Robert Edward (CPSO#: 72375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Dinniwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dinniwell ( CPSO# 72375 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD DINNIWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINNIWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2005