Dion, Maryse (CPSO#: 73019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3591 Innes Road
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1C 1T1
Phone: (613) 830-2877
Fax: (613) 249-3720
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYSE DION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2001