Dirks, Martha Heather (CPSO#: 66748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Sainte Justine
Gastroenterology
3175 Cote Sainte-Catherine
Montreal QC  H3T 1C5
Phone: (514) 345-4931 Ext. 6661
Fax: (514) 345-4999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTHA HEATHER DIRKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 1996 to 05 Mar 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 1996 to 05 Mar 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 May 1996 to 28 May 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 25 Jun 2000
Resident 6 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 26 Jun 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1997