Diwanji, Sanket Ranvir (CPSO#: 90137)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Baroda University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 23 Mar 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009