Dixon, Anthony Richard (CPSO#: 80763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Memorial
Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 322-2501
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 7056584544
Fax: 7056584917
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Dixon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dixon ( CPSO# 80763 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Department of Family Medicine
Emergency Medicine and Anaesthesia
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY RICHARD DIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2007