Dizon, Stephanie (CPSO#: 96724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Warwick, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Division of Endocrinology
1967 Riverside Drive, 4th floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 88333
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE DIZON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIZON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 30 Aug 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 22 Nov 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2016