Dlamini, Nomazulu (CPSO#: 89825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  07 Sep 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7721
Fax: 416-813-6334
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nomazulu Dlamini may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Dlamini holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Dlamini  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Dlamini's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Dlamini's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on September 24, 2014, and currently has an
                  interim expiry date of September  7,  2019.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate  may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs  2
                  and 3 above.