Dobkin, Karen Jennifer (CPSO#: 98082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9773
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER DOBKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2015