Dobles-Dizon, Christine O (CPSO#: 78888)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2003 to 14 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 15 May 2003 to 04 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 2004