Dobyns, Jessica Laura (CPSO#: 95453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brookdale Family Clinic
304 Bellevue st
Peterborough ON  K9H 5G1
Phone: 705-743-7101
Fax: 705-743-7104
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Partners in Pregnancy Clinic
Suite 302
170 Simcoe st
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Canada
Phone: 705-741-1191
Fax: 705-741-1192
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LAURA DOBYNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBYNS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2014