Dochev, Atanas Krumov (CPSO#: 80480)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Medical University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Shore Regional Hospital
90 Glen Allan Drive
Bridgewater NS  B4V 3S6
Phone: (902) 527-5215

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 24 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006